U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00865-3
  • Case Name: USA v. TANTUSHYAN, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2019: [Bond]
  • June 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • June 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bond]
  • June 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • May 29, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 29, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.