U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00929-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAWFIK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.