U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00931-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANDOVAL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Amended Complaint ]
  • June 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Arrest]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.