U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00116
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ACCESS WCP, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.