U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 04, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.