U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-gj-00446-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAND JURY MATTER #1
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Government Notice of Dislcosure]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Sealing and Impounding]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Defender Association]
  • July 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Government Notice of Dislcosure]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Sealing and Impounding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.