U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00967-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIVERA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 20, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • June 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.