U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00974-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILANO TONY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • October 04, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.