U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00986-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POINTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • June 07, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.