U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BYRNES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.