U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00998-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JULIO CAESAR CONCEPCION, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 18, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.