U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00716
  • Case Name: THE HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK v. PETERNEL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 25, 2019: [Vacate]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Clerk's Entry of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.