U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00131
  • Case Name: IMAGE MASTERS, INC. et al v. ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2020: [Remark]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • February 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.