U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHAQUAN JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.