U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00132
  • Case Name: FORKS SPECIALTY METALS INC et al v. GRAND RIVERS IRONSANDS INCORPORATED et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 01, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.