U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VICTOR MANSON, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 24, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.