U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALVARADO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.