U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01429-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Cond. of Ptrl Release]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 02, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.