U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALCSIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.