U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00139
  • Case Name: GRANNAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Certified Copy of Order]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Final Discipline Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 23, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Final Discipline Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.