U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01526-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BONNER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2019: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.