U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRAZIER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order for Probation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Report and Order of Probation]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order for Probation]
  • November 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Report and Order of Probation]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order for Probation]
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 16, 2019: [Add Counts]
  • July 16, 2019: [Remark]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.