U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ASHFORD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • July 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.