open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00934
    Party Name:MCCUE v. TOWNSHIP OF HANOVER et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258731
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =