U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AINSLEY HUNTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 07, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.