U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00149
  • Case Name: IN RE: NOVARTIS AND PAR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 30, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.