U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00150
  • Case Name: IN RE: DEPOSITION OF TIANNA GRIFFIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [US Marshal Return]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Contempt]
  • August 15, 2019: [Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.