U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00151
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.