U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01415-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIMITRE HADJIEV
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • August 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.