U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01441-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEEKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 23, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.