U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00152
  • Case Name: ALLYN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Final Discipline Order]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • November 03, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • November 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Discipline]
  • October 20, 2020: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Disbarment]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Application/Petition]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.