U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01427-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDNET SHIMELES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 27, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.