U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00153
  • Case Name: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS AND EMPLOYERS' PENSION FUND v. BANOS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Praecipe/Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Interrogatories in Attachment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • October 02, 2019: [Praecipe/Request]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.