U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01554-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WOLL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • January 06, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.