open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01150
    Party Name:JMJ REALTY, LLC et al v. JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?259814
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =