open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04131
    Party Name:CHAMBERS v. BOGAN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?561632
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =