open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04155
    Party Name:GILLILAND v. TRANS UNION, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Attorney)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?561631
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =