U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00158
  • Case Name: NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. HUDSON PALMER HOMES, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Approve Consent Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Stipulation and Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • December 11, 2020: [Intervene]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 07, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
  • December 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • October 13, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Intervene]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
  • October 24, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.