U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00161
  • Case Name: CARDONA et al v. VIVINT SOLAR, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.