U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01578-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NICKOLAS PASSINEAU
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.