U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-01061
  • Case Name: I.U.P.A.T. DISTRICT COUNCIL #57 COMBINED FUNDS v. ROETTERS PAINTING, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Writ Issued]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Clerk's Entry of Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • November 20, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • November 12, 2019: [Writ Issued]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Clerk's Entry of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.