U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01672-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOPKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 09, 2019: [Arrest]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • October 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.