U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00167
  • Case Name: DOHERTY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Certified Copy of Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Final Discipline Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 09, 2020: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Discipline]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript - No PDF]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Statement]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Response]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Application/Petition]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.