U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00168
  • Case Name: UHS OF DELAWARE, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMINISTRATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Case Transferred Out]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Transfer]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Memorandum]
  • December 31, 2019: [Transfer]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
  • October 24, 2019: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2019: [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.