U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00170
  • Case Name: BROKERAGE CONCEPTS LLC et al v. KATZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.