U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01746-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMILO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Arrest - Rule 40]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.