U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-01108
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Application / Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.