U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01771-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORRIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 01, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • November 24, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.