U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-01143
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SLANE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 11, 2019: [Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Quash]
  • November 21, 2019: [Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.