U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01801-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANTIAGO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Bond]
  • November 08, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • November 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 30, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 28, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arrest]
  • October 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.